+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to The Senate
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Adopted - AYES: 114 NOES: 045
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor