+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 2-TUESDAY, APRIL 18, 2006- UPON ADJOURNMENT
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics
On April 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 3, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 0
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Objection Filed. Removed from Consent Calendar - Rule 44
On March 14, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - No Action Taken
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor