+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time