+ − Actions (12)
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Adopted - YEAS: 23 NAYS: 0
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On May 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred: Rules
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported to The Senate
On April 30, 2003 in the House:
- Adopted
On April 28, 2003 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 22, 2003 in the House:
- Referred: Administration and Accounts
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor