+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
0360H01.01H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor