+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time