+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- House Message
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Escort Committee - Representatives: Plocher, Veit, Trent, Christofanelli, Evans, Mitten, Ellebracht, Mackey, Roberts, and Sauls
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Escort Committee - Senators:Emery, Hegeman, Luetkemeyer, Onder, White, Sifton, Rizzo, May, Nasheed, and Holsman
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
- Adopted
- Taken Up
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted
- Offered
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor