+ − Actions (20)
On July 12, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 25 NAYS: 08
On May 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On April 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred: Rules
On April 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 25, 2001 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 083 NOES: 073
- HS Adopted in House
- House Substitute Offered
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On April 2, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 26, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Spec Committee on Public/Private Partnerships
On February 28, 2001 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 27, 2001 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor