+ − Actions (13)
On May 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On May 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On May 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred: Rules
On May 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On May 2, 2001 in the House:
- HCR Adopted and Third Read - AYES: 150 NOES: 000
On April 30, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 11, 2001 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On March 14, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 6, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor