+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor