+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Dropped from Calendar - Rule 44
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Calendar
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Laid Over
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor