+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Vet Affairs, Pensions,& Urban Affairs
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 121 NOES: 7
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
- Read Second Time
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time