+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 25 NOES: 4
- Senate Message
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Senate Lounge, 12:00pm
- Public Hearing Held
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 109 NOES: 42
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected with Amendments - ha 1, ha 2, ha 3 adopted
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Referred: General Laws
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor