+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor