+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Motion to Do Pass Failed - HCS
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time