+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Downsizing State Government
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time