+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor