+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 15, 2009 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (76)
Type:
Primary Sponsor