+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 15, 2014, 8:00am, Senate Committee Room 1
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Pensions
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 112 NOES: 36
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
4458H02.02L
Adopted
4458H02.03L
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor