+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 10
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rural Community Development
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor