+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 2, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor