+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 136 NOES: 23
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS #2 Voted Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to Committee: Budget
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (80)
Type:
Primary Sponsor