+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Social Services
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time