+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 019 NOES: 008
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 117 NOES: 039
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Laid Over - Third Reading
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor