+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor