+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture Policy
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor