+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- Adopted - AYES: 123 NOES: 013
On May 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On May 3, 2012 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: International Trade and Job Creation
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor