+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics
On April 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to The Senate
On April 24, 2012 in the House:
- Adopted
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 16, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor