+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Adopted - YEAS: 24 NAYS: 05
On May 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, MAY 1, 12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics
On April 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to The Senate
On April 23, 2012 in the House:
- Adopted
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Offered