+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin
- Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin - General Laws
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
4699H02.02H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor