+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor