+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 1
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - not Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - not Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor