+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Adopted - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 00
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred: Rules
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 17, 12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to The Senate
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Adopted
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor