+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Utilities
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor