+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- House Concurs - SA 1 AYES: 141 NOES: 1
- Adopted - AS AMENDED AYES: 141 NOES: 3
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SA 1
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held - TUESDAY, MAY 10, 2011, 12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred: Rules
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to The Senate
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Adopted
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor