+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 22, 2014, 2:00pm, Pershing Conference Room
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 118 NOES: 29 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor