+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled
- Public Hearing Held
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred: Rules
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to The Senate
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Adopted
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor