+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Adopted - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 00
On May 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On May 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, MAY 8, 12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to The Senate
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- Adopted
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor