+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
- Adopted - AYES: 31
- Taken Up
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 15, 2014, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 8, 2014, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge, Public hearing scheduled bill not heard
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted - HA 1 ADOPTED
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to The Senate
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
5423H02.01H
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor