+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to The Senate
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Adopted
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor