+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Adopted - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
On April 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 19, 2011,12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to The Senate
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Adopted
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Offered