+ − Actions (8)
On January 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Escort Committee - REPRESENTATIVES ALLEN, BRUNS, FAITH, HOBBS, KINGERY, LIPKE, SCHLOTTACH, SUTHERLAND, WALLACE, WASSON,ROORDA,RUCKER,JONES,SCAVUZZO,SCHUPP, STILL,SWINGER, TALBOY, WALSH AND ZIMMERMAN
On January 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Escort Committee - SENATORS SHIELDS, ENGLER, MAYER, BARTLE, NODLER, CALLAHAN, GREEN, BARNITZ, DAYS AND KEAVENY
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Adopted - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
On January 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported to The Senate
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- Offered
- Offered
- Adopted
- Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor