+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Insurance Policy
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor