+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 8, 2006 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SPA 1
On May 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SPA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
On April 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY APRIL 5, 2006-1:OOPM-SENATE LOUNGE
On March 29, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Economic Development,Tourism & Local Gov
On March 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 27, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - HPA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 156 NOES: 0
On March 14, 2006 in the House:
- Pursuant to Rule 44 - HBs for Perfection Consent - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 12, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2005 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor