+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 9, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 28, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 28, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 14, 2004 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 115 NOES: 47
- House Concurs - SS#2 AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 115 NOES: 47
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS#2 AS AMENDED
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2, SA 4 ADOPTED YEAS: 30 NAYS: 4
- SS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED/SS#2 PENDING
- Senate Substitute Offered - SS#2
- SS Withdrawn
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Agriculture,Conservation,Parks & Nat Res
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 105 NOES: 45
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Corrected Fiscal Note - FURNISHED AN UPDATED FISCAL NOTE AND DOES NOT REQUIRE FISCAL REVIEW
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 2 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time