+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 19, 2011, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 153 NOES: 3
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 147 NOES: 2
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources
On January 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor