+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor