+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 30, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 28, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 28, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 14, 2004 in the House:
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 151 NOES: 7
- House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 9
On May 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
- Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 139 NOES: 22
- House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 137 NOES: 23
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
- Conference Committee Substitute
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Conferees Re-appointed - REPRESENTATIVES BAKER, BYRD, ST.ONGE, SEIGFREID AND SKAGGS
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- SEE COMMENTS - MOTION TO RECONSIDER CCR#2 ADOPTED YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0 MOTION TO ADOPT CCR#2 WITHDRAWN
- Senate Requests Further Conference
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- House Grants Conference
- Conferees Re-appointed - SENATORS YECKEL, NODLER, SCOTT, COLEMAN AND CASKEY
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
- Conference Committee Substitute
On May 10, 2004 in the House:
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
- Conference Committee Substitute
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
- Conference Committee Substitute
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Offered
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES ST.ONGE, BAKER, BYRD, SEIGFREID AND SKAGGS
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS YECKEL, NODLER, SCOTT, COLEMAN AND CASKEY
On May 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight - YEAS: 29 NAYS: 0
On April 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2004 in the House:
- Second Rd/Refer: Fin & Govt Org, Vet Affairs & Elections
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 147 NOES: 13
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- House Substitute Offered
- HS Adopted in House
- Perfected
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Small Business
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor