+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Utilities
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 8, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor