+ − Actions (20)
On July 10, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
On April 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Economic Development,Tourism & Local Gov
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Defeated - AYES: 92 NOES: 65
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 119 NOES: 28 PRESENT: 10
On March 10, 2003 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On January 9, 2003 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 17, 2002 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor